KY HB279 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-20)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Chapter 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 446 to specify that government shall not burden a person's or religious organization's freedom of religion; protect the right to act or refuse to act on religious grounds; specify that government shall prove by clear and convincing evidence prove a compelling governmental interest in establishing a burden on the freedom of religion; specify what constitutes a burden.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to construction of the law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27Senatedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts Chapter 111)
2013-03-26Senateenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2013-03-26Senatepassed 32-6
2013-03-26Senateveto overriden
2013-03-26Senateposted for consideration of Governor's veto
2013-03-26Senatereceived in Senate
2013-03-26Housepassed 79-15
2013-03-26Houseveto overriden
2013-03-26Houseposted for consideration of Governor's veto
2013-03-25Housereceived in House
2013-03-25Senateveto message received in House
2013-03-22HouseVetoed
2013-03-11Housedelivered to Governor
2013-03-11Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2013-03-11Housereceived in House
2013-03-07Senate3rd reading, passed 29-6
2013-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
2013-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2013-03-05Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2013-03-05Senate1st reading
2013-03-05Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2013-03-05Senateto Judiciary (S)
2013-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2013-03-01House3rd reading, passed 82-7 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2)
2013-02-28Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2013-02-27Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2013-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2013
2013-02-25Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2013-02-22Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2013-02-22House2nd reading
2013-02-22Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2013-02-21Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2013-02-21House1st reading
2013-02-21Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2013-02-15Houseposted in committee
2013-02-11Houseto Judiciary (H)
2013-02-07Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback