KY HB276 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the Department for Medicaid Services to accept the employment of temporary COVID-19 personal care attendants as meeting necessary training for State Registered Nurse Aides; require the Department for Medicaid Services to apply for any Medicaid waivers or state plan amendments necessary; incorporate the provisions into the nurse aide training and competency evaluation program requirements; promulgate any necessary administration regulations; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to temporary nurse aides and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 97 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2021-02-24Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-23House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2021-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021
2021-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-09Houseposted in committee
2021-02-02Houseto Health & Family Services (H)
2021-01-13Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback