KY HB276 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 080)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 080)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal various sections in KRS Chapters 11, 15., 18A, 36, 64, 146, 147, 153, 158, 164, 171, 177, 198B, 205, 211, 216, 336, 342, and 403 to abolish inactive boards, commissions, committees, and councils, including the Agricultural Resource Development Authority, the Architectural Barriers Advisory Committee, the Athletic Trainers Advisory Council, the Auto and Truck Recyclers Licensing Advisory Board, the Capitol Centennial Commission, the Cardiovascular Disease Initiative, the Child Support Enforcement Commission, the Children’s Health Insurance Program Advisory Council, the Diabetes Research Board, the Council on Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, the Advisory Committee for Educational Improvement, the e-Health Network Board, the Council for Families and Children, the Family Health Care Providers Board, the Innovation Commission, the Labor-Management Advisory Council, the My Old Kentucky Home Advisory Commission, the National Guard and Reserve Employers’ Council, the Natural History Museum Board of Directors, the Personnel Steering Committee, the Public Officials Compensation Commission, the Southern Growth Policies Board, the Underground Railroad Advisory Council, the War of 1812 Bicentennial Commission, the Workers’ Compensation Advisory Council, the Bicentennial Commission, the Health Care Infrastructure Authority, and the Historical Events Celebration Commission; amend KRS 148.400 to direct the use of funds in the “My Old Kentucky Home Endowment Fund”; amend KRS 403.705 to decrease the responsibilities of local domestic violence coordinating councils and to direct any recommendations be transferred to the commissioner of the Department for Community Based Services; repeal, reenact and amend KRS 407.707 to create a Sexual Assault Response Team Advisory Committee attached to the Department for Community Based Services, staffed as necessary by the secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; transfer any committee recommendations to the commissioner of the Department for Community Based Services; require the secretary to make certain appointments; establish continuation of service of members of the Sexual Assault Response Team Advisory Committee; direct transfer of funds of abolished boards, commissions, committees, and councils to the appropriate cabinets and agencies; amend various KRS sections to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to statutorily mandated boards, councils, and commissions within state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 080) |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | passed 93-0 |
2017-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 |
2017-02-27 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-13 | House | to State Government (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | introduced in House |