KY HB274 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 167)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 167)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 150.010 to define "conservation officer" and "conservation officer R class"; amend KRS 150.090 to give powers to conservation officers and individuals employed as conservation officer R class; create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to define the duties of a conservation officer R class; create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to indemnify any conservation officer or individual employed as a conservation officer R class; and amend KRS 15.460 and 186.675 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to conservation officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Daniel Elliott [R] |
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. Tommy Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1019 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 90 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 90 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 167) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-04 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-08 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | introduced in House |