KY HB271 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 16.601 and 61.621 to remove provisions which reduce line of duty or duty-related death benefits upon remarriage; establish non-codified sections to: provide that an eligible surviving spouse who has subsequently remarried shall have their benefit increased; provide that an eligible surviving spouse of a member whose death was determined by the systems to be a direct result of an act in line of duty or a duty-related injury, but chose to receive monthly death benefits in lieu of line of duty benefits, shall receive line of duty or duty-related death monthly benefits; provide that Kentucky Retirement System shall establish process by which a surviving spouse of a member who died prior to retirement and prior to April 13, 2018, may apply for the line of duty death benefits; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to death-in-line-of-duty benefits and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1395 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 69 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 69 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 46) |
2020-03-19 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2020-03-17 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-30 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-01-30 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-21 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies