KY HB27 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to name and designate as the official pets of Kentucky domestic cats and dogs that reside in or have been adopted from Kentucky animal shelters or rescue organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to state symbols.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 23 (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-01-23Senatereceived in Senate
2020-01-22House3rd reading, passed 90-2
2020-01-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2020-01-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto State Government (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-07-11HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback