KY HB27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.470 to exempt from sales and use tax the sale of admissions to events held by nonprofit organizations and to remove the specific exemption for county fairs to conform; amend KRS 139.200 to conform; apply to transactions occurring on or after July 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to exempting admissions to events held by nonprofit organizations from sales and use taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] | Rep. Joe Graviss [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-09-07 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |