KY HB27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 148)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 148)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186A.170 to increase the issuance time of a speed title from within 24 hours to within 48 hours.
Title
AN ACT relating to speed titles.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Stewart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 148) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | received in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2017-03-07 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2017-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | posted in committee |
2017-01-03 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
2016-12-06 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB27.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB27/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB27/vote_history.pdf |