KY HB266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 159.075 to include parents or guardians who are transferring to a reserve component or separating from the military under honorable conditions; include a home under contract to be built as a qualifying residence; allow qualifying students to temporarily reside outside of district if the housing is unavailable and be included in the attending district's average daily attendance.
Title
AN ACT relating to children of military families.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Koch [R] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] |
Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1316 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 83 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 83 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 28) |
2020-03-17 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-17 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | received in House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-0 |
2020-02-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 7, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-17 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | introduced in House |