KY HB265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 37)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 37)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 134 to require the annual sheriff's tax settlement audit to be one audit for the period September 1 to August 31 including specific taxes and every type of tax for which a collection schedule has been completed, delinquent tax claims have been filed, and settlements have been prepared; amend KRS 132.192 to require sheriffs in counties with a population of 70,000 or less to provide a complete statement of funds and expenditures for the preceding calendar year to the fiscal court by March 15; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to sheriffs' tax settlements.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Imes [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1671 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 81 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 81 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 37) |
2021-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2021-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | introduced in House |