KY HB262 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 097)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 097)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 194A to require all employees of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services, including contract staff, with access to federal tax information to submit to a criminal background investigation and require the promulgation of administrative regulations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 42 to require all employees of the Department of Revenue, including contract staff, with access to federal tax information to submit to a criminal background investigation and require the promulgation of administrative regulations; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to federally mandated background checks and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 097) |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2017-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-13 | House | to State Government (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB262.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB262/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB262/vote_history.pdf |