KY HB261 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 92)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to define "mounted wildlife specimen"; require the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources to promulgate administrative regulations allowing any person or entity to sell or buy mounted wildlife specimens except as prohibited under federal law; require the department to record transactions for mounted wildlife specimens for white-tailed deer, elk, bears, turkeys, and bobcats; exempt mounted wildlife specimens sold to or purchased from licensed taxidermists under KRS 150.4111 from the requirements of the section; create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to define "gross score"; require the gross score for white-tailed deer and elk to be calculated using the Boone and Crockett Club's scoring manual by an official scorer; allow measurements to be taken at any time, with no drying time being required; establish enhanced restitution values for illegally taken white-tailed deer, elk, bears, turkeys, and bobcats; allow the commissioner or designee to bring a civil action to recover the restitution values owed; revoke hunting licenses and privileges for persons owing restitution; specify that the restitution required under this section is in addition to all other penalties and restitution established by KRS Chapter 150 and the administrative regulations established thereunder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to taken wildlife.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22Housesigned by Governor (Acts Chapter 92)
2013-03-12Housedelivered to Governor
2013-03-12Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2013-03-12Housereceived in House
2013-03-07Senate3rd reading, passed 35-3
2013-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
2013-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2013-03-05Senatereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2013-03-05Senate1st reading
2013-03-05Senatetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2013-03-04Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2013-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2013-02-26House3rd reading, passed 95-2
2013-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013
2013-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2013-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2013-02-19Houseposted in committee
2013-02-07Houseto Natural Resources & Environment (H)
2013-02-06Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback