KY HB257 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 45 to establish the Kentucky contribution trust fund and require reporting of deposits to and expenditures from the fund; amend KRS 12.270 to conform; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to donations made to the Commonwealth, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 108 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 02, 2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-02-16 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Budget and Financial Administration
Courts
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Courts
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies