KY HB249 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 156)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 139.340 to allow a remote retailer no later than the first day of the calendar month that is at most sixty days after the threshold requirement is met to register for a sales and use tax permit; amend KRS 139.450 to eliminate the requirement of a marketplace provider to register for a second sales and use tax number for its marketplace retailers and replace it with the option to obtain a second sales and use tax number or to report sales on its own number and provide the Department of Revenue with a separate breakdown of receipts for its marketplace retailers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to revenue, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1819 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 391 (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 390 (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 368 (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1771 (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 122 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29Senatedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 156)
2021-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-29Senatereceived in House
2021-03-29HouseBill passed 28-10
2021-03-29Housevetoes overridden
2021-03-29Houseposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2021-03-29Houseto Rules (S)
2021-03-29Housereceived in Senate
2021-03-29SenateBill passed 62-32
2021-03-29Senatevetoes overridden
2021-03-29Senateposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2021-03-29Senateto Rules (H)
2021-03-29Senatereceived in House
2021-03-26Houseline items vetoed
2021-03-16Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-16Housepassed 62-33
2021-03-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-16Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-16Housetaken from Rules (H)
2021-03-16Houseto Rules (H)
2021-03-16Housereceived in House
2021-03-16Senate3rd reading, passed 27-6 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021
2021-03-15Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-02Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-03-02Senate2nd reading
2021-03-02Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-03-01Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-03-01Senate1st reading
2021-03-01Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-03-01Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-02-26Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-25House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendments (2) (4) and (5)
2021-02-24Housefloor amendments (2), (3), (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-02-23Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-02-23Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021
2021-02-23Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2021-02-09Houseposted in committee
2021-02-09Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-02-09House1st reading
2021-02-09Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-02-04Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-01-11Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-11Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback