KY HB248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 171)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 171)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 235.240 to specify application of enforcement and penalties; amend KRS 235.990 to add the choice of fines or imprisonment for violations of KRS 235.240; amend KRS 431.005 to give a peace officer the ability to arrest an intoxicated operator of a motorboat or vessel without a warrant.
Title
AN ACT relating to boating safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 994 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 83 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 83 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 171) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-3 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-07 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | introduced in House |