KY HB247 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 309.133 to revise the method of licensure for professional art therapists and to provide criteria for licensure as a professional art therapist associate.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensure of art therapists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2012-03-07 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-06 | 3rd reading, passed 87-9 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2012 | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-29 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-10 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-17 | to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2012-01-12 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB247.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB247/bill.doc |