KY HB244 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 162)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

The Judicial Branch Budget: Detail Part I, Operating Budget; appropriate to Court of Justice: 2021-2022: $11,765,500, 2022-2023: $436,597,100, $440,802,800, 2023-2024: $449,669,900; appropriate to Judicial Retirement System: 2021-2022: $18,800, 2022-2023: $5,711,800, 2023-2024: $6,037,300; detail Part II, Capital Projects Budget; detail Part III, General Provisions; detail Part IV, Budget Reduction or Surplus Expenditure Plan; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the Judicial Branch of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, boards, commissions, subdivisions, and other state-supported activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 458 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2282 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 214 (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 213 (Y: 22 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-08Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 162)
2022-03-30Housedelivered to Governor
2022-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2022-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2022-03-30Housepassed 94-2
2022-03-30HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
2022-03-30Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
2022-03-30Houseto Rules (H)
2022-03-30Housereceived in House
2022-03-30Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
2022-03-29Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2022-03-29Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2022-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
2022-03-29Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2022-03-16Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2022-03-16Senate2nd reading
2022-03-16Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2022-03-14Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2022-03-14Senate1st reading
2022-03-14Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2022-03-08Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2022-03-07Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2022-03-07Senatereceived in Senate
2022-03-04House3rd reading, passed 88-1 with Committee Substitute (1)
2022-03-04Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2022-03-04Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2022-03-04Housetaken from Rules (H)
2022-03-04Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2022-03-03Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2022-03-02Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2022-03-02House2nd reading
2022-03-02Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2022-01-18Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2022-01-13Housereturned to Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-13House1st reading
2022-01-13Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback