KY HB240 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020 to create the Office for Education and Workforce Statistics and the Board of the Kentucky Center for Education and Workforce Statistics; create new sections of KRS Chapter 151B to establish the duties of the Office for Education and Workforce Statistics and the Kentucky Center for Education and Workforce Statistics and to clarify which public agencies shall contribute education and workforce data to the system; confirm Executive Order 2012-1029.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 90) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-3 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2013-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | introduced in House |