KY HB24 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 7)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 7)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate to the Department of Veterans' Affairs $2,500,000 from the General Fund in fiscal year 2019-2020 for design and preconstruction costs for the Bowling Green Veterans Center; stipulate that appropriations in this Act shall be paid from the General Fund Surplus Account or the Budget Reserve Trust Fund Account; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Bowling Green Veterans Center, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1256 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 36 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 36 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 7) |
2020-03-02 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-02 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-02-28 | House | received in House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2020-02-10 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 |
2020-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-14 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-07-09 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Health and Medical Services
State Agencies
Veterans
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Health and Medical Services
State Agencies
Veterans