KY HB231 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to allow the Department for Community Based Services to request a criminal justice agency to perform a federal name-based criminal history record check of each adult residing in a home in which a child is placed during an emergency placement; allow the Department of Kentucky State Police and the Federal Bureau of Investigation to charge a reasonable fee for processing a fingerprint-based criminal history record check.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to criminal history record checks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 99 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
2023-03-15Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2023-03-15Senate2nd reading
2023-03-15Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2023-03-14Senateto Judiciary (S)
2023-03-14Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2023-03-14Senate1st reading
2023-03-14Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2023-03-02Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2023-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2023-03-01House3rd reading, passed 94-0
2023-02-24Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023
2023-02-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2023-02-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2023-02-16Houseto Judiciary (H)
2023-02-09Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2023-02-09Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback