KY HB23 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.070 to require KHSAA to promulgate administrative regulations or bylaws requiring schools to designate all interscholastic athletics based upon the biological sex of the students eligible to participate; prohibit male students from participating in girls' athletics; establish how to designate biological sex; prohibit designated agencies from entertaining complaints or investigations of policies; create a cause of action against a school that violates these provisions; create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to require a public postsecondary education institution or private postsecondary education institution that is a member of a national intercollegiate athletic association to designate all intercollegiate and intramural athletics authorized by the institution based on biological sex of students eligible to participate; require that institutions prohibit male students from participating in womens' athletics; prohibit designated agencies from entertaining complaints or investigations of policies; create a cause of action against a postsecondary institution that violates these provisions; title the Act "Fairness in Womens' Sports Act."
Title
AN ACT relating to athletics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-11 | House | to Education (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-06-11 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Athletics
Boards and Commissions
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Claims
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Short Titles and Popular Names
Universities and Colleges
Women
Athletics
Boards and Commissions
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Claims
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Short Titles and Popular Names
Universities and Colleges
Women