KY HB225 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 12 to require administrative bodies to issue professional licenses or certificates to military service members or veterans within two years of an honorable discharge if the training received by the service member or veteran could reasonably be expected to provide the necessary experience and skills; grant the administrative body the right to deny licensure or certification if training is not equivalent; allow appeal rights; require administrative bodies to promulgate administrative regulations to carry out the provisions of the Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to occupational licensure for military service members and veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Rick Nelson [D] |
Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | received in Senate |
2016-04-15 | Senate | veto overriden in House 71-8 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2016-04-15 | Senate | received in House |
2016-04-13 | House | vetoed |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders #1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-29 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate committee title amendment withdrawn |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Substitute withdrawn |
2016-03-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-23 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-21 | Senate | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-18 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1), committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-14 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-12 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2016-01-11 | House | introduced in House |