KY HB224 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 241.010 to define "commercial quadricycle" and "university sports stadium"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 243 to establish and regulate authorized public consumption (APC) licenses for use with a commercial quadricycle, racetrack, or university sports stadium; allow patrons to bring their own packaged alcoholic beverages in non-glass containers for personal consumption on an APC licensed premises; require all alcoholic beverage consumption in nondescriptive plastic cups; limit the use of an APC license at a racetrack or university sports stadium to race or sport event dates within the local hours of alcohol sales; permit more than one separately licensed APC premises at a racetrack or stadium if each separate premises is clearly designated; forbid consumers from taking open alcoholic beverages from the licensed premises; set qualifications for a commercial quadricycle APC license, including a business office and secure storage, general liability insurance of at least $2,000,000, and a local government permit; establish the standards for local ordinances covering commercial quadricycles; set commercial quadricycle APC license requirements consistent with the package, container, and sales restrictions for a racetrack or stadium; name the qualifications for a commercial quadricycle driver; forbid local APC fees from exceeding state APC fees; amend KRS 243.030, 243.060, and 243.070 to designate state and local APC license fees; amend KRS 244.085 to allow a person under 21 years of age to remain at a licensed APC premises; amend KRS 243.034 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 58-30 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |