KY HB222 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - floor amendment (3) and (4-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - floor amendment (3) and (4-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 116.095 to require that the county clerk redact the Social Security number from any voter registration record before allowing the record to be inspected, duplicated, or furnished.
Title
AN ACT relating to voter registration records.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] |
Rep. Russ Meyer [D] | Rep. Jerry Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | floor amendment (3) and (4-title) filed |
2016-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2016-02-29 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-12 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2016-01-11 | House | introduced in House |