KY HB221 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.746 to modify the membership of the governing board of the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority; amend KRS 164A.050 to modify the membership of the governing board of the Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation; amend KRS 164A.055 to authorize the Asset Resolution Corporation to engage in student loan activities; remove references to administration by the Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to higher education finance and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-01-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-10 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
State Agencies
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
State Agencies