KY HB221 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-8)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-8)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.412 to permit a veteran to request, at the time of application or renewal, that a personal identification card or an operator's license issued under KRS 186.412 bear a designation denoting the applicant's status as a veteran; require applicant to present an original or copy of his or her DD-214 form; exempt Circuit Clerk from any liability for misread or fraudulent DD-214 forms.
Title
AN ACT relating to veteran's designations on operator's licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 11) | |
2012-03-22 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-22 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-22 | received in House | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 | |
2012-03-21 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2012 | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-31 | to Transportation (S) | |
2012-01-27 | received in Senate | |
2012-01-26 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-26 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day Thursday, January 26, 2012 | |
2012-01-25 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 31, 2012 | |
2012-01-24 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2012-01-19 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-12 | recommitted to Transportation (H) | |
2012-01-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-09 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-09 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-06 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB221.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB221/bill.doc |