KY HB216 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 403.720 to include violence against an animal used as coercive conduct in the definition of "domestic violence and abuse"; amend KRS 403.740 to allow a judge to award possession of a domestic animal to the petitioner; amend KRS 456.010 to include violence against an animal used as coercive conduct in the definition of "dating violence and abuse"; amend KRs 456.060 to allow a judge to award possession of a domestic animal to the petitioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to interpersonal violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 289 (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 81-3 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-18Housefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2020-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-17Housereturned to Rules
2020-03-12Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
2020-03-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-02Houseposted in committee
2020-01-10Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-01-08Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback