KY HB215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 063)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 393A to establish the unclaimed property trust fund; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to unclaimed property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 950 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 133 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 063)
2019-03-25Housefiled without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
2019-03-13Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-12Housereceived in House
2019-03-12Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2019-02-28Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-25House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-19Housereassigned to State Government (H)
2019-02-06Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback