KY HB214 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 10)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 10)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to establish the Veterinary Contract Spaces Program; require the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to administer the program; require the authority to purchase enrollment spaces annually for Kentucky students at participating veterinary schools; establish the Veterinary Contract Spaces Program trust fund; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Veterinary Contract Spaces Program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 170 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1255 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1255 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 10) |
2020-03-04 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-03 | House | passed 92-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-02 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-02-28 | House | received in House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2020-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-15 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-10 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | introduced in House |