KY HB214 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-05 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-05 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 121.015 to define "personal funds" and include the payment of personal funds in the definition of "contribution."
Title
AN ACT relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-03 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-02 | 3rd reading, passed 92-6 | |
2010-01-27 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 28, 2010 | |
2010-01-27 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-26 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-12 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-11 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2010-01-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB214.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB214/bill.doc |