KY HB210 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 508.025 to include assaults on local health department personnel within the offense of assault in the third degree.
Title
AN ACT relating to assault in the third degree.
Sponsors
Rep. Wilson Stone [D] | Rep. Bart Rowland [R] | Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 |
2016-02-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-11 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-01-08 | House | introduced in House |