KY HB21 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - floor amendment (2) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.17A-200 to extend health-status eligibility rules to individual and employer-organized association markets; authorize insurance commissioner to designate additional health status-related factors; prohibit adjustment of premium or contribution amounts for group health benefit plans on the basis of genetic information; amend KRS 304.17A-220 to remove requirements relating to preexisting condition exclusions; repeal and reenact KRS 304.17A-230 to define "preexisting condition exclusion"; prohibit health benefit plans in any market from imposing any preexisting condition exclusion; amend KRS 304.17A-155, 304.17A-250, 304.17A-430, 304.17A-706, 304.17B-001, 304.17B-019, and 304.18-114 to conform; provide that provisions of Act apply to all health benefit plans issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2021; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to mandatory benefits for health benefit plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2020-02-20Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-01-07Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-07-03HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback