KY HB209 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 33)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 217.217 to prohibit state and local government entities from restricting the donation of game meat to or from the Kentucky Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources, any other government agency, or cooperative extension agencies for the purposes of education, promotion of hunting or fishing, or free meal distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the donation of game meat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1672 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 59 (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 33)
2021-03-11Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-11Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-11Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-11Housereceived in House
2021-03-05Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2021-03-04Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021
2021-03-04Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-03Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2021-02-22Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2021-02-10Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-10House3rd reading, passed 85-3
2021-02-09Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021
2021-02-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-02Houseposted in committee
2021-01-13Houseto Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
2021-01-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback