KY HB208 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that school districts may request approval for more than 10 student attendance days under a nontraditional instruction plan related to the COVID-19 emergency; require a school to submit a nontraditional instruction plan for the 2021-2022 school year within the Comprehensive District Improvement Plan by May 1, 2021; provide for how districts shall measure daily student participation while operating under an approved nontraditional instruction plan due to COVID-19; suspend any extended school calendar requirement for an educational program for state agency children; allow school districts to provide additional emergency leave days for staff due to the COVID-19 public health emergency; direct the Kentucky Department of Education to seek federal waivers regarding school meal service rules in relation to the COVID-19 public health emergency; provide that the Kentucky Board of Education may waive statewide assessment and accountability system requirements in accordance with federal waivers received; direct the Kentucky Department of Education to seek federal waivers from the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act in relation to the COVID-19 public health emergency; allow a local board of education to revise its certified evaluation plan due to the COVID-19 public health emergency; allow a principal to award additional educational enhancement opportunity days to students to meet obligations that occur prior to the last day of school due to the COVID-19 public health emergency; allow school districts to email required notices to school district employees; allow school districts to use the school district attendance data selected by the district pursuant to 2020 Senate Bill 177 to calculate average daily attendance; allow a school to count up to 30 minutes as instructional time when used for COVID-19 related activities for in-person instruction; make the provisions of the Act retroactive to the 2020-2021 school year and effective for the 2021-2022 school year, if applicable; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to education and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 206 (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1626 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 104 (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1626 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 104 (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 9) |
2021-03-04 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-04 | House | passed 81-15 |
2021-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | received in House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-8 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-8 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (5) |
2021-02-22 | House | floor amendments (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-11 | House | floor amendments (1) and (3) withdrawn |
2021-02-11 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | House | floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Effective Dates, Emergency
Retroactive Legislation
State Agencies
Teachers
Education, Finance
Effective Dates, Emergency
Retroactive Legislation
State Agencies
Teachers