KY HB207 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 120)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to prohibit a local government entity from taking any legislative or executive action that has the purpose or effect of impairing a consumer's ability to use a utility service that is described in KRS 278.010(3)(a), (b), or (c) and that is provided by a utility regulated by the Public Service Commission under KRS Chapter 278 or is otherwise incorporated under KRS Chapter 279.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to energy source availability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 308 (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1669 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 94 (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 120)
2021-03-15Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-15Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-15Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-15Housepassed 64-23
2021-03-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-12Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-11Houseto Rules (H)
2021-03-11Housereceived in House
2021-03-05Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-04Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021
2021-03-04Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-03Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-02-26Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2021-02-24Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-23House3rd reading, passed 71-23 with floor amendment (1)
2021-02-22Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2021-02-10Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021
2021-02-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-02Houseposted in committee
2021-01-13Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2021-01-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback