KY HB205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to establish a separate income tax credit for tuition assistance based on contributions made to a qualified scholarship-granting organization; create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to provide goals and reporting of metrics related to those goals; amend KRS 141.0205 to establish the order in which the credits may be taken; create a new section of KRS 136.500 to 136.575 to allow financial institutions to take the tax credit against the tax imposed by KRS 136.505; create a new section of KRS 136.500 to 136.575 to order all tax credits; create a new section of KRS Chapter 136 to require the Kentucky Department of Education to publish a list of certified nonpublic schools and nonpublic schools seeking certification; require the Department of Revenue to report information to the Legislative Research Commission; amend KRS 131.190 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to opportunities in education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-04House2nd reading
2019-03-04Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-01Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-01House1st reading
2019-03-01Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-13Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback