KY HB205 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-21 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-21 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 requiring high schools to include CPR training in the health education curriculum.
Title
AN ACT relating to cardiopulmonary resuscitation training in schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Denver Butler [D] | Rep. John Carney [R] |
Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Jesse Crenshaw [D] |
Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] |
Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] |
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Terry Mills [D] |
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. Darryl Owens [D] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] | Rep. David Watkins [D] |
Rep. Jim Wayne [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-12 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 18, 2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-15 | House | to Education (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | introduced in House |