KY HB204 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 446,350 to define "government" and "substantially burden"; outline relief that may be sought if statute is violated; appy to laws adopted before or after enaction of this statute; include severability clause; waive sovereign, governmental, and qualified immunity.
Title
AN ACT relating to restoring religious liberty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-01 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | introduced in House |