KY HB203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 209)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

The Judicial Branch Budget: appropriate $440,265,200 in fiscal year 2018-2019 and $445,291,600 in fiscal year 2019-2020 from the General Fund, Restricted Funds, and Federal Funds; provide General Fund moneys for pay equity initiative; provide General Fund moneys for defined calculations; provide General Fund moneys to replace Federal Funds; provide that funds in the Court Operations and Administration appropriation unit carry forward; provide that if the Supreme Court retains the 2008 increase in civil filing fees, the additional income, not to exceed $5,000,000 in each fiscal year, shall be deposited in a trust and agency account for court operations; provide General Fund moneys for local facility assessments; provide General Fund moneys for increased CERS rates on janitorial and maintenance staff in judicial centers and courthouses; provide funds to compensate local units of government for providing court space and for costs incurred in the development of local court facilities; provide that funds in the Local Facilities Fund carry forward; provide that funds in the Local Facilities Use Allowance Contingency Fund carry forward; provide funds for actuarial-assessed judicial retirement benefits; detail project scope and use allowance payments for Bath, Butler, Crittenden, Jessamine, and Jefferson County court houses; authorize lease purchase of a Court of Appeals office building in Franklin County; provide General Fund support for use allowance payments for Jefferson County; defer General Fund support for operating costs, annualized use allowance payments, and nonrecurring furniture and equipment costs for Bath, Butler, Crittenden, and Jessamine Counties to the 2020-2022 fiscal biennium; authorize leases; clarify that nothing in this bill shall reduce funding of court facility projects authorized by the General Assembly; provide that if a court facility project is occupied and use allowance funding is insufficient that use allowance payments must be approved from the Local Facilities Use Allowance Contingency Fund, or if funds are not available in the Local Facilities Use Allowance Contingency Fund, the use allowance payments shall be deemed a necessary government expense; provide the Director of the Administrative Office of the Courts with expenditure authority; provide for severability of budget provisions and priority of individual appropriations; declare that KRS 48.312 controls duplicate appropriations; clarify that KRS 48.313 controls when a total or subtotal of the bill conflicts with a sum of the appropriations of which it consists; provide that any unexpended balance remaining in the Court's Restricted Funds or Federal Funds accounts carry forward; provide for the final budget document; provide for the transferability of funds; provide for appropriations revisions; include funds for trial commissioner salaries as provided for in the Judicial Branch Budget Recommendation; provide that issuance of paychecks scheduled for June 30, 2018, June 30, 2019, and June 30, 2020, shall not be issued prior to July 1, 2018, July 1, 2019, and July 1, 2020; provide for participation in any Budget Reduction Plan or Surplus Expenditure Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the Judicial Branch of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, boards, commissions, subdivisions, and other state-supported activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 457 (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FCCR RSN# 697 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 574 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 203 (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27Senatedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 209)
2018-04-14Senatereturned to Rules
2018-04-14Senateplaced in the Orders of the Day for Friday, April 14, 2018
2018-04-14Senatetaken from Rules (H)
2018-04-14Senateto Rules (H)
2018-04-13Senatereceived in House
2018-04-13Houseline items vetoed
2018-04-02Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-02HouseBill passed 81-9
2018-04-02Houseposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
2018-04-02Housetaken from Rules
2018-04-02HouseFree Conference Committee report adopted in House
2018-04-02Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-02HouseFree Conference Committee report filed in House
2018-04-02Housereceived in House
2018-04-02SenateBill passed 35-3
2018-04-02SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
2018-04-02SenateFree Conference Committee report filed in Senate
2018-03-22SenateFree Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2018-03-22SenateConference Committee report adopted in House
2018-03-22SenateConference Committee report adopted in Senate
2018-03-22SenateConference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2018-03-22SenateConference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2018-03-22SenateSenate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-22Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate for Thursday, March 22, 2018
2018-03-21Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-21HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute
2018-03-21Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-21Housetaken from Rules
2018-03-21Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-21Housereceived in House
2018-03-20Senate3rd reading, passed 26-12 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-20Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018
2018-03-20Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2018-03-16Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-16Senate2nd reading
2018-03-16Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-15Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-15Senate1st reading
2018-03-15Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-06Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-01House3rd reading, passed 84-8 with Committee Substitute
2018-03-01Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018
2018-03-01Housetaken from Rules (H)
2018-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-28Housereported favorably with Committee Substitute
2018-02-22Houseposted in committee
2018-02-16Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-16House1st reading
2018-02-16Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-01-18Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-01-16Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback