KY HB203 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Bill defeated 43-49
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Bill defeated 43-49
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 121.180 to establish a single threshold for campaign finance reporting; EFFECTIVE November 4, 2015.
Title
AN ACT relating to campaign finance reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Bill defeated 43-49 |
2015-03-25 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2015-03-25 | House | received in House |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Bill passed 28-10 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-10 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-10 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | received in House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-8 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 9, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2015-02-11 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |