KY HB202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 167)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 167)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Set out the 2018-2020 Biennial Highway Construction Plan; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to road projects and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 458 (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 614 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 614 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 614 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 614 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 167) |
2018-04-02 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill passed 76-14 |
2018-04-02 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-04-02 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-04-02 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-16 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 66-25 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-16 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-16 | House | 1st reading |
2018-02-16 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | introduced in House |