KY HB200 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-14 - posted in committee
Pending: House Labor and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-14 - posted in committee
Pending: House Labor and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 227A.100 to require biennial rather than annual renewal of electrician and electrical contractor licenses; establish biennial license renewal on or before the last day of the licensee's birth month in each odd-numbered year; increase level of continuing education from 6 to 12 hours to reflect change to biennial renewal; make effective January 1, 2011.
Title
AN ACT relating to electricians.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-07 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2010-01-06 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB200.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB200/bill.doc |