KY HB20 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to define terms; establish a student loan forgiveness program for STEM teachers employed at a public school district within a federally designated promise zone; authorize the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to promulgate administrative regulations to administer the program; create the STEM teacher promise zone scholarship fund; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to teachers and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-07-02 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Economic Development
Education, Finance
Science and Technology
Teachers
Appropriations
Economic Development
Education, Finance
Science and Technology
Teachers