KY HB199 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-28 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 148)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-28 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 148)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 177.106 to define "encroachment"; clarify the requirement for an encroachment permit, as well as the power of the Transportation Cabinet to order encroachments removed or remedied; allow for a civil fine for a person who encroaches upon the right-of-way of a state-maintained road without obtaining a permit; allow municipalities to collect fines for violations, and use the funds for public safety or infrastructure; repeal KRS 177.103
Title
AN ACT relating to rights-of-way on state roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1748 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 83 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 83 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-28 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 148) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | passed 35-1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2021-03-15 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2021-03-05 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-1 |
2021-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-02 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | introduced in House |