KY HB196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 20 of KRS Chapter 304 to prohibit insurers from refusing to issue a policy of motor vehicle liability insurance, or imposing an additional premium, solely because the person is uninsured if, during the period the person was without insurance, the person was on military service and absent from the Commonwealth; require insurers to inquire about military service upon application for insurance; provide penalties for insurers who demonstrate a willful pattern of noncompliance.
Title
AN ACT relating to the prohibition of patriot penalties in insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1664 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 62 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 62 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 17) |
2021-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | introduced in House |