KY HB195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 100.273 to 100.292 to define "natural gas transmission pipeline," "operator", and "person"; limit the application of the section to cities and counties that have adopted the provisions of KRS Chapter 100 and to preliminary development plans filed on or after the effective date of the Act; establish notification requirements for developers that are locating developments within 660 feet of natural gas transmission pipelines; require a notified pipeline operator to provide pipeline location information to the developer; require the developer to include language on the final plat filed with the planning commission stating that the developer has utilized reasonable means to notify the pipeline operator and verify the pipeline location; require planning commissions to gather raw National Pipeline Mapping System geospatial data within 60 days of the effective date of the Act; exempt planning commissions from liability for development approval if it is based on the geospatial information they obtain; require pipeline operators to file the names of their registered agents with planning commissions of jurisdiction no later than August 15, 2022; prohibit planning commissions from issuing final approval for developments until the requirements of the Act have been satisfied; exempt planning commissions from liability for development approval if it is based on the information required to be submitted under the Act; provide that the Act shall not exempt developers or operators from the requirements of the Underground Facility Damage Protection Act of 1994, KRS 367.4901 to 367.4917.
Title
AN ACT relating to pipeline location notification.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2228 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 66 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 66 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 70) |
2022-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-1 with Floor Amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2022-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 27, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2022-01-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-12 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Energy
Housing, Building, and Construction
Local Government
Local Mandate
Notices
Oil and Natural Gas
Planning and Zoning
Property
Public Safety
Safety
Housing, Building, and Construction
Local Government
Local Mandate
Notices
Oil and Natural Gas
Planning and Zoning
Property
Public Safety
Safety