KY HB195 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

The Judicial Branch Budget: Detail Part I, Operating Budget; appropriate to Court of Justice: 2020-2021: $440,802,800, 2021-2022: $447,867,300; appropriate to Judicial Retirement System: 2020-2021: $7,147,500, 2021-2022: $8,017,100; detail Part II, Capital Projects Budget; detail Part III, General Provisions; detail Part IV, Budget Reduction or Surplus Expenditure Plan; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the Judicial Branch of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, boards, commissions, subdivisions, and other state-supported activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1516 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 29 (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenateConference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2021-01-13SenateSenate refused to recede from Committee Substitute
2021-01-13Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute
2021-01-13Senatereceived in Senate
2021-01-13HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute
2021-01-13Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for concurrence or non-concurrence
2021-01-13Housetaken from Rules
2021-01-13Houseto Rules (H)
2021-01-13Housereceived in House
2021-01-13Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0-1 with Committee Substitute
2021-01-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 13, 2021
2021-01-12Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2021-01-11Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-01-11Senate1st reading
2021-01-11Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-01-11Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2021-01-11Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-11Senatereceived in Senate
2021-01-11House3rd reading, passed 76-19 with Committee Substitute
2021-01-11Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2021-01-11Housetaken from Rules
2021-01-11Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2021-01-09Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-01-09House2nd reading
2021-01-09Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-01-08Houseposted in committee
2021-01-08Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-01-08Housereturned to Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-08House1st reading
2021-01-08Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback