KY HB194 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.143 to provide that a student enrolled in a district-operated alternative education program shall be eligible to seek attainment of a High School Equivalency Diploma under certain conditions.
Title
AN ACT relating to alternative education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2209 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 54 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 54 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78) |
2022-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | received in House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-01-31 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Floor Amendments (1), (2) and (3-title) |
2022-01-18 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3-title) filed |
2022-01-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 18, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |