KY HB193 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 189)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 508.025, relating to the Class D felony of assault in the third degree, to add intentionally causing a peace officer to come in contact with bodily fluids or bodily waste to the elements of the crime; increase the criminal penalty to a Class C felony for contact with fluids which could transmit a communicable disease; and clarify that the existing provisions regarding detention facilities apply to adult and juvenile facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to assault in the third degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 519 (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 2, SFTA 1 RSN# 659 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 298 (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 297 (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 189)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Housepassed 78-11
2018-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-04-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-04-14Housetaken from Rules
2018-03-29Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-29Housereceived in House
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-03-27Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1-title) filed
2018-03-27Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-22Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-16Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-03-15Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-14House3rd reading, passed 81-3 with Committee Substitute and floor amendments (2) and (3)
2018-02-21Housefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-20Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 20, 2018
2018-02-15Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-22Houseposted in committee
2018-01-17Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-01-11Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB193.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/SCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/SFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB193/SFA2.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/HB193/LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/HB193/CI.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/HB193/HCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/HB193/HCS1CI.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB193/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/HB193/SCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/HB193/SCS1CI.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback