KY HB190 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 212.840 to target funding for district health departments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to district health departments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-02-05Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-02House3rd reading, passed 87-0
2018-02-01Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 2, 2018
2018-01-31House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-30Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-25Houseposted in committee
2018-01-17Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-01-11Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback